United States of America v. Mahon et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kerry C Mahon and RBS Citizens, N.A.,
Case Number: 1:2018cv11695
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Plymouth
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Kerry C Mahon answer/response due 10/17/2018. (MacDonald, Gail)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 17, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kerry C Mahon.(Bretta, Laurel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kerry C Mahon answer/response due 10/3/2018. (DaSilva, Carolina)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kerry C Mahon.(Bretta, Laurel)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Murphy on behalf of United States of America (Murphy, Edward)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by United States of America. RBS Citizens, N.A., served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Murphy, Edward)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by United States of America. Kerry C Mahon served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Murphy, Edward)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ENDORSED ORDER entered re: #2 Motion for Lis Pendens (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kerry C Mahon, RBS Citizens, N.A.,. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Lis Pendens by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Lis Pendens, #2 Affidavit James Strandjord)(Strandjord, James)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RBS Citizens, N.A.,, Kerry C Mahon (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HUD 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Strandjord, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/13/2018) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/13/2018) (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry C Mahon
Represented By: Laurel E. Bretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Citizens, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James M. Strandjord
Represented By: Edward J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?