Factory Mutual Insurance Company v. Skanska USA Building, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: J.C. Cannistraro, LLC and Skanska USA Building, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11700
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 03:10 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer J.C. Cannistraro, LLC answer due 11/9/2018. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 9, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by J.C. Cannistraro, LLC.(Hebbel, Grace)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J.C. Cannistraro, LLC. (Hebbel, Grace)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace V. Hebbel on behalf of J.C. Cannistraro, LLC (Hebbel, Grace)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Skanska USA Building, Inc. answer due 11/9/2018.; granting. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Passeri, Matthew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 9, 2018 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 9, 2018 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint ( Responses due by 9/6/2018) by Skanska USA Building, Inc..(Hebbel, Grace)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skanska USA Building, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Skanska AB, Corporate Parent Skanska USA Inc. for Skanska USA Building, Inc... (Hebbel, Grace)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace V. Hebbel on behalf of Skanska USA Building, Inc. (Hebbel, Grace)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J.C. Cannistraro, LLC, Skanska USA Building, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skanska USA Building, Inc., J.C. Cannistraro, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7272026 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Passeri, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #2 Category Form) (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Factory Mutual Insurance Company v. Skanska USA Building, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew R. Passeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Cannistraro, LLC
Represented By: Grace V. Hebbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanska USA Building, Inc.
Represented By: Grace V. Hebbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?