MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Series 17-04-631 and MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Defendant: The Plymouth Rock Company, Inc. and Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11702
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard D. Meadow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard D. Meadow Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7322406 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 17-04-631.(Kelley, Walter)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation, Inc., The Plymouth Rock Company, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Plymouth Rock Company, Inc., Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7272119 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series 17-04-631. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Kelley, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series 17-04-631
Represented By: Walter Kelley
Represented By: Richard D. Meadow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Walter Kelley
Represented By: Richard D. Meadow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Plymouth Rock Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plymouth Rock Assurance Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?