Bradeen et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association et al
Plaintiff: David C. Bradeen and Susan A. Bradeen
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank, A.G., Residential Asset Securities Corporation, Residential Capital, LLC, GMAC Mortgage Group, LLC, GMAC-RFC Holding Company, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, Ally Financial, Inc. and Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv11753
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is extended to 10/26/2018. COPY MAILED. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Susan A. Bradeen, David C. Bradeen.(Halley, Taylor)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiffs shall have until October 8, 2018 to file a response to the #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. COPY MAILED. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, Notice to Quit, #2 Exhibit Docket from Prior Action, #3 Exhibit Answer & Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit Judgment & Findings, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appeal)(Polansky, Kevin)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association.(Polansky, Kevin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Pleadings)(Polansky, Kevin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (McKillop, Matthew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Kingston on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Corporation, as Trustee for Residential Asset Securities Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2002-, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Successor to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Corporation, as Trustee for Residential Asset Securities Corpo (Kingston, Christine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Corporation, as Trustee for Residential Asset Securities Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2002-, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Successor to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Corporation, as Trustee for Residential Asset Securities Corpo ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7279872 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Polansky, Kevin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/17/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/17/2018) (McKillop, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradeen et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Asset Securities Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC-RFC Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Christine Kingston
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Bradeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan A. Bradeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?