In Re. Kupperstein et al
Appellant: Donald C. Kupperstein
Trustee: John Fitzgerald and Debora A. Casey
Appellee: Irene Schall and Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Undetermined: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Interested Party: Thomas Sheedy
Case Number: 1:2018cv11772
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Appellees' Brief due by 12/24/2018). (Simeone, Maria)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 Opposition re #14 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to December 24, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to #10 Appellant's Brief, #13 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-11772 and 18-11851 filed by Donald C. Kupperstein. (Baker, David)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to December 24, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to #10 Appellant's Brief, #13 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order , Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases 18-11772 and 18-11851 ( Responses due by 10/16/2018) by Executive Office of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appellant Notices of Appeal, #2 Exhibit EOHHS Motion to Reassign, #3 Exhibit Appellant Briefs Cover Sheets)(O'Neill, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order entered. Appellants brief received on 9/11/18. Appellee Brief due by 10/11/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/25/2018. (Simeone, Maria)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Simeone, Maria)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by U.S. Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 initial transmittal)(Montes, Mariliz)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Appellant's BRIEF by Donald C. Kupperstein. Appellee Brief due by 10/11/2018. (Baker, David)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Having considered the appellant's emergency motion for stay pending appeal and all supporting documents submitted therewith, the motion for a stay is DENIED. re #5 Motion to Stay (Simeone, Maria)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin added. Judge Denise J. Casper no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion to Reassign Case. (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Rossi on behalf of Thomas Sheedy (Rossi, Mark)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Stay , with certificate of service, by Donald C. Kupperstein. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Volume 1, #3 Volume 2, #4 Volume 3)(Baker, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Reassign Case by Donald C. Kupperstein.(Baker, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-10098. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Kupperstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald C. Kupperstein
Represented By: David G. Baker
Represented By: David B. Madoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Debora A. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Irene Schall
Represented By: Roger C. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Paul T. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Thomas Sheedy
Represented By: Mark C. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?