Securities and Exchange Commission v. Grewal
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Harpreet Grewal
Case Number: 1:2018cv11778
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Burns on behalf of Harpreet Grewal (Burns, Brian)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Smith on behalf of Harpreet Grewal (Smith, Patrick)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Patrick J. Smith, Brian T. Burns. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Franklin, Yvonne)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of patrick j. smith; brian t. burns Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7294475 by Harpreet Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit patrick j. smith, esq., #2 Affidavit brian t. burns, esq.)(Peabody, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Peabody on behalf of Harpreet Grewal (Peabody, Robert)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Harpreet Grewal waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Vito, Michael)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel E. Hershfang on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Hershfang, Rachel)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Scheffler on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Scheffler, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Harpreet Grewal. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harpreet Grewal (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Vito, Michael) (Attachments 1 & 2 replaced on 8/21/2018 to correct fillable PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpreet Grewal
Represented By: Patrick J. Smith
Represented By: Brian T. Burns
Represented By: Robert L. Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Michael J. Vito
Represented By: Rachel E. Hershfang
Represented By: David M. Scheffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?