Lickerish, Ltd. v. Rue La La, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lickerish, Ltd.
Defendant: Does 1 - 10 and Rue La La, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11783
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 27, 2018 to Defendant to Answer or otherwise Respond by Lickerish, Ltd..(Parker, Robert)
September 4, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lickerish, Ltd.. Rue La La, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Parker, Robert)
August 22, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Does 1 - 10, Rue La La, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
August 21, 2018 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 21, 2018 2 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Parker, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/21/2018 to correct fillable PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).
August 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Does 1 - 10, Rue La La, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7284748 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lickerish, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original image, #2 Exhibit B - Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Screenshots, #4 Civil Cover Sheet and Catagory Form)(Parker, Robert) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/21/2018 to correct fillable PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lickerish, Ltd. v. Rue La La, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lickerish, Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rue La La, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?