Fotohaus, LLC v. Invested Development, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fotohaus, LLC
Defendant: Miguel Granier and Invested Development, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11813
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Miguel Granier, Invested Development, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
August 29, 2018 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 28, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David C. Deal Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7295322 by Fotohaus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Attorney David C. Deal In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Twohig, Michael)
August 28, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fotohaus, LLC. (Twohig, Michael)
August 28, 2018 3 REPORT on the filing of copyright case AO 121 Form by Fotohaus, LLC. (Twohig, Michael) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/29/2018 due to fillable format ) (DaSilva, Carolina).
August 24, 2018 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination re: Copyright - AO 121. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of copyright case (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 23, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7289579 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fotohaus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Fotohaus Complaint, #2 USDC Mass Category Form Fotohaus Complaint)(Twohig, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/24/2018 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fotohaus, LLC v. Invested Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fotohaus, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Twohig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Granier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invested Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?