Sadowski v. EH Publishing Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive and EH Publishing Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11819
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christopher Sadowski. (Kressler, Steven)
October 2, 2018 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND CLOSING ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
October 2, 2018 13 NOTICE: Counsel have reported that this case has settled. A 30 day settlement order of dismissal will enter and this case will be closed. (Simeone, Maria)
September 12, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed EH Publishing Inc. served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Kressler, Steven)
August 29, 2018 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Saba A. Basria. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 29, 2018 10 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 11/26/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 28, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Saba Basria Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7294852 by Christopher Sadowski. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kressler, Steven)
August 28, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to DOES 1-10, inclusive, EH Publishing Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 28, 2018 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 24, 2018 6 Category Sheet by Christopher Sadowski. (Kressler, Steven) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/28/2018 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).
August 24, 2018 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 24, 2018 4 EXHIBIT re: #1 Complaint, by Christopher Sadowski. Pursuant to the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Section (G) Number (4): Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 24, 2018 3 REPORT on the filing of copyright case (Kressler, Steven)
August 24, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christopher Sadowski (Kressler, Steven) Modified text on 8/24/2018 (DaSilva, Carolina).
August 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, inclusive, EH Publishing Inc. d/b/a EH Media Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7290242 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kressler, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/24/2018) (DaSilva, Carolina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadowski v. EH Publishing Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EH Publishing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Represented By: Steven A. Kressler
Represented By: Saba A. Basria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?