In Re. Kupperstein et al
Appellant: Donald C. Kupperstein
Appellee: Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Case Number: 1:2018cv11851
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin added. Judge Denise J. Casper no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion to Reassign Case to Judge Sorokin. (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Reassign Case by Executive Office of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeal of Orders Granting Relief from Stay, #2 Exhibit Appeal of Order denying Contempt agst EOHHS)(O'Neill, Paul)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Donald C. Kupperstein re #5 Appellant's Brief . (Baker, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by Donald C. Kupperstein. Appellee Brief due by 10/24/2018. (Baker, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 JUDGMENT of the USCA (18-1854): The petition for mandamus relief is DENIED. (Paine, Matthew)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-10098. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Kupperstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald C. Kupperstein
Represented By: David G. Baker
Represented By: David B. Madoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Paul T. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?