Murphy v. ACAS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chapter 11 Trustee Harold B Murphy and Harold B Murphy
Defendant: Michael McGee, ACAS, LLC, Douglas Weekes, Myung Yi, Anuj Khanna, David Eaton, Gordon O'Brien, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, Daniel Katz and Ares Management L.P.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11884
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, David Eaton, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Michael McGee, Gordon O'Brien, Douglas Weekes, Myung Yi. (Horne, Jonathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 28 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, David Eaton, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Michael McGee, Gordon O'Brien, Douglas Weekes, Myung Yi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Reply)(Horne, Jonathan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Harold B Murphy. (Bennett, Charles)
October 18, 2018 Filing 25 Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Harold B Murphy. (Bennett, Charles)
October 16, 2018 Filing 24 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 MOTION for Joinder in Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (Paine, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 23 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered "MOTION DENIED."denying #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2018 Filing 22 Opposition re #19 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , #21 MOTION for Joinder in Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Harold B Murphy. (MacIver, Andrea)
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Joinder in Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by David Eaton, Michael McGee, Douglas Weekes.(Wish, Benjamin) (Modified on 10/15/2018 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
October 15, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, David Eaton, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Michael McGee, Gordon O'Brien, Douglas Weekes, Myung Yi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Gordon O'Brien, Myung Yi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Bankruptcy Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- District Court Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Horne, Jonathan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #17 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court : Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, David Eaton, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Michael McGee, Gordon O'Brien, Douglas Weekes, Myung Yi. (Attachments: #3 Proposed Order)(Horne, Jonathan) (Modified on 10/15/2018 to Correct Docket Text and File Memorandum of Law in Support as Separate Docket Entry) (Paine, Matthew).
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added David B. Bergman, Michael L. Bernstein, and Michael A. Lynn. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael A. Lynn Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7341148 by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Gordon O'Brien, Myung Yi. (Attachments: #1 Certification of A. Lynn)(Horne, Jonathan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael L. Bernstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7341142 by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Gordon O'Brien, Myung Yi. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael L. Bernstein)(Horne, Jonathan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David B. Bergman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7341123 by ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Gordon O'Brien, Myung Yi. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David B. Bergman)(Horne, Jonathan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Horne on behalf of ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Gordon O'Brien, Myung Yi (Horne, Jonathan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Cohn on behalf of ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Gordon O'Brien, Myung Yi (Cohn, Daniel)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harold B Murphy. David Eaton waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Michael McGee waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Douglas Weekes waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (MacIver, Andrea)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harold B Murphy. ACAS, LLC waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Ares Capital Corporation waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Ares Capital Management LLC waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Ares Management L.P. waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Ares Management LLC waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Stephen Chehi waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Daniel Katz waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Anuj Khanna waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Gordon O'Brien waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Myung Yi waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (MacIver, Andrea)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wish on behalf of David Eaton, Michael McGee, Douglas Weekes (Wish, Benjamin)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M. Cooper on behalf of David Eaton, Michael McGee, Douglas Weekes (Cooper, Howard)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L. MacIver on behalf of Harold B Murphy (MacIver, Andrea)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Condon on behalf of Harold B Murphy (Condon, Christopher)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Bennett, Jr on behalf of Harold B Murphy (Bennett, Charles)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACAS, LLC, Ares Capital Corporation, Ares Capital Management LLC, Ares Management L.P., Ares Management LLC, Stephen Chehi, David Eaton, Daniel Katz, Anuj Khanna, Michael McGee, Gordon O'Brien, Douglas Weekes, Myung Yi. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (DaSilva, Carolina)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7300705 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Harold B Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 D. Mass. Category Sheet)(Evans, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. ACAS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McGee
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wish
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACAS, LLC
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Weekes
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wish
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myung Yi
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anuj Khanna
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Eaton
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wish
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon O'Brien
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ares Capital Management LLC
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ares Capital Corporation
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ares Management LLC
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Chehi
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Katz
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ares Management L.P.
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: Michael A. Lynn
Represented By: Michael L. Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chapter 11 Trustee Harold B Murphy
Represented By: David L. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold B Murphy
Represented By: David L. Evans
Represented By: Andrea L. MacIver
Represented By: Christopher Michael Condon
Represented By: Charles R. Bennett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?