Marradi v. WFB Futurama Rentals LLC et al

Plaintiff: Raoul Marradi
Defendant: WFB Futurama Rentals LLC and Diamonds Restaurant Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv11892
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to 11/21/18 (Hourihan, Lisa)
November 1, 2018 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 21, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by WFB Futurama Rentals LLC.(Loftus, Richard)
September 25, 2018 5 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Todd W. Shulby. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 20, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd W. Shulby, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7326864 by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Florida Bar Letter of Good Standing)(Garno, Edward)
September 5, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Diamonds Restaurant Group, Inc., WFB Futurama Rentals LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 5, 2018 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Diamonds Restaurant Group, Inc., WFB Futurama Rentals LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7303318 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Raoul Marradi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Garno, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marradi v. WFB Futurama Rentals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raoul Marradi
Represented By: Edward N. Garno
Represented By: Todd W. Shulby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFB Futurama Rentals LLC
Represented By: Richard S. Loftus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamonds Restaurant Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?