Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc. v. M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828) et al

Plaintiff: Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.
Defendant: La Dolce Vita, Ltd. and M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828)
Case Number: 1:2018cv11928
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828). (Holbrook, Seth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return: Release of vessel M/V Bonnie Lynne (O.N. 743828) to Owner, located at Fairhaven Shipyard Companies on 9/18/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for arrest of vessel:M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N. 743828) at 50 Fort St. Fairhaven, MA on 9/14/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 Judge Mark L. Wolf: "ALLOWED and SO ORDERED." ENDORSED ORDER entered re #18 Stipulation filed by M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828), La Dolce Vita, Ltd. (Bono, Christine)
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION (Joint) For the Release of M/Y LA DOLCE VITA by La Dolce Vita, Ltd., M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828). (Holbrook, Seth)
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth S. Holbrook on behalf of La Dolce Vita, Ltd., M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828) (Holbrook, Seth)
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER AND SUPPLEMENTAL PROCESS IN THE FORM OF A RESTRAINING ORDER entered. (Bono, Christine)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Order. (Bono, Christine)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 Emergency MOTION for Order to Emergency Motion For Appointment of Special Process Server and Supplemental Process in the Form of A Restraining Order , #13 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exemplar Orders)(Smith, David)
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 ADDENDUM re #12 Emergency MOTION for Order to Emergency Motion For Appointment of Special Process Server and Supplemental Process in the Form of A Restraining Order filed by Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit e-mail, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, David)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Order to Emergency Motion For Appointment of Special Process Server and Supplemental Process in the Form of A Restraining Order by Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc..(Smith, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN entered; granting #5 Motion to Appoint Custodian. (Bono, Christine)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 WARRANT OF ARREST issued as to M/Y La Dolce Vita. (Bono, Christine)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER AUTHORIZING ARREST AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WARRANT OF ARREST entered; granting #2 Motion for Order. (Bono, Christine)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to La Dolce Vita, Ltd., M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828). Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian of M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828), #2 MOTION for Order to To Arrest M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828) Exigent Circumstances Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule C(3)(a)(ii) by Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.. (Smith, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian of M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828) by Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Kevin McLaughlin)(Kantor, Julie)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Order to To Arrest M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828) filed by Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.. (Kantor, Julie)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Smith on behalf of Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc. (Smith, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to To Arrest M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828) by Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Warrant)(Kantor, Julie)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7315654 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 JS45 Category Form)(Kantor, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc. v. M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Dolce Vita, Ltd.
Represented By: Seth S. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y LA DOLCE VITA (O.N.743828)
Represented By: Seth S. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Towboat Nantucket Sound, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Smith
Represented By: Julie L. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?