Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc. v. Global Companies LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc.
Defendant: Global Montello Group Corp. and Global Companies LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv11977
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:2801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/03/18 to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #30 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc..(Briansky, Richard)
November 8, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp.. (Staib, Karen)
November 8, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp..(Staib, Karen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 28 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the forgoing reasons, plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction (Docket No. #7 ) is DENIED. So ordered.(McDonagh, Christina)
October 18, 2018 Filing 27 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2018 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc. Court hears arguments on the motion and takes the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Debra Lajoie at lajoiedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Briansky, Staib, King. Ewer) (Lima, Christine)
October 18, 2018 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Montello Group Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Global Operating LLC for Global Montello Group Corp... (Staib, Karen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Companies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Global Operating LLC for Global Companies LLC.. (Staib, Karen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael A. King. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael A. King Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7369918 by Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Michael A. King in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice))(Staib, Karen)
October 17, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond S. Ewer on behalf of Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp. (Ewer, Raymond)
October 17, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Affidavit of William F. Murray)(with certificate of service). (Briansky, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Affidavit of William F. Murray). (Briansky, Richard)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Stephen Lundgren in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction) by Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Staib, Karen)
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp.. (Staib, Karen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, (Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint) by Global Montello Group Corp.. (Staib, Karen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants To File Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction) by Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp.. (Staib, Karen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting #13 Motion to Continue (Attachments: #1 Signed Stipulation) (McDonagh, Christina)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing to 10/18/2018 and Entry of Stipulation by Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Staib, Karen)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Staib on behalf of Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp. (Staib, Karen)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc. Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Global Montello Group Corp. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Carr, Peter)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Global Companies LLC served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Carr, Peter)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit A))(Briansky, Richard)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc..(Briansky, Richard)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc.. (Briansky, Richard)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Tab A))(Briansky, Richard)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Global Companies LLC, Global Montello Group Corp.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Francis Carr, II on behalf of Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc. (Carr, Peter)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against Global Montello Group Corp., Global Companies LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7326538 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet)(Briansky, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc. v. Global Companies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Montello Group Corp.
Represented By: Raymond S. Ewer
Represented By: Michael A King
Represented By: Karen Staib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Companies LLC
Represented By: Raymond S. Ewer
Represented By: Michael A King
Represented By: Karen Staib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hopkinton Friendly Service, Inc.
Represented By: Richard E. Briansky
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?