Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v. Century Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv12041
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Hourihan, Lisa)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion to Seal Arbitration Information. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Century Indemnity Company's Response to LLoyd's Petition to Confirm by Century Indemnity Company.(Fuller, R.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information (and Joinder in LLoyd's Motion) filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Fuller, R.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/12/18 to Respond to Petition to Confirm (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 12, 2018 to Respond to Petition to Confirm by Century Indemnity Company.(Fuller, R.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to 10/29/18. (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Confirm by Century Indemnity Company.(Fuller, R.)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Century Indemnity Company served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Mullins, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Zelig on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Zelig, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Darian M. Butcher on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Butcher, Darian)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Century Indemnity Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Mullins, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Arbitration Information by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London.(Mullins, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London in re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mullins, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Complaint, . (Mullins, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for an Order Confirming Arbitration Award and Entering Judgment against Century Indemnity Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7344397 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Mullins, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v. Century Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By: R. Victoria Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Michael P. Mullins
Represented By: Darian M. Butcher
Represented By: Jonathan S. Zelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?