Capizzi v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Salvatore John Capizzi
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv12043
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salvatore John Capizzi. (Murphy, Brendan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salvatore John Capizzi. (Murphy, Brendan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Salvatore John Capizzi. Nancy A Berryhill served on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Murphy, Brendan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 12/31/2018. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry #1 corrected because: Attorney filed Notice of Appearance as an exhibit to their Complaint. Court Staff refiled as a separate entry. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan C. Murphy on behalf of Salvatore John Capizzi (McDonagh, Christina)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7344780 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Salvatore John Capizzi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Supplement Category form.(Murphy, Brendan) Modified on 10/1/2018 (McDonagh, Christina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capizzi v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore John Capizzi
Represented By: Brendan C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher A. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?