Securities and Exchange Commission v. Knox et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: WB21 US Inc, Michael T. Gastauer, Wintercap SA Inc., Silverton SA Inc., B2 Cap Inc., Roger Knox, Wintercap SA, C Capital Corp, WB21 NA Inc., Simone Gastauer Foehr, Raimund Gastauer, B21 Ltd., WB21 DMCC and Shamal Internaional FZE
Case Number: 1:2018cv12058
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 62 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in support of Motion for Default Judgment. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 27, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in support of motion for default judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Shields, Kathleen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 60 Notice of Service of Process filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Individual(s)/Entities served: Simone Gastauer Foehr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shields, Kathleen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 59 Mail dkt. #51 sent to Silverton SA Inc. c/o Michael Gastauer returned to sender - "moved". (Pacho, Arnold)
November 16, 2018 Filing 58 Copy re #57 Preliminary Injunction mailed to Roger Knox on 11/16/2018. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 16, 2018 Filing 57 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Preliminary Injunction, Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 16, 2018 Filing 56 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #55 Motion to Amend Preliminary Injunction. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 15, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Amend Preliminary Injunction by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Preliminary Injunction)(Shields, Kathleen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Shields, Kathleen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 53 Copy re #51 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default mailed to addresses provided on proof of service. Sent via certified mail receipt numbers: (# 7002 0510 0004 1358 7258 - Wilmington, DE) (# 7002 0510 0004 1358 7241 - Albany, NY) (# 7002 0510 0004 1358 7395 - Palo Alto, CA). (Pacho, Arnold)
November 6, 2018 Filing 52 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #51 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 6, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to B2 Cap Inc., C Capital Corp, Silverton SA Inc., WB21 NA Inc., WB21 US Inc, Wintercap SA Inc. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 6, 2018 Filing 50 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #49 Motion for Entry of Default as to defendants WB21 US Inc., Silverton SA Inc., WB21 NA Inc., C Capital Corp., Wintercap SA Inc., and B2 Cap Inc. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 5, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendants WB21 US Inc., Silverton SA Inc., WB21 NA Inc., C Capital Corp., Wintercap SA Inc., and B2 Cap Inc. by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Shields, Kathleen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2018: #1 Exhibit A) (Pacho, Arnold).
October 26, 2018 Filing 47 Copy of #46 Preliminary Injunction mailed to Roger Knox on 10/26/2018. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 26, 2018 Filing 46 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Preliminary Injunction, Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 26, 2018 Filing 45 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: granting #34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2018 re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The court agreed that, if appropriate, it would entertain motions to modify the injunction by defendants once service is made and/or counsel enter appearances. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Rebecca Israel, Kathleen Shields, and Jonathan Allen for the SEC; William Connolly, Roger Knox's appointed counsel in the criminal case appeared only in that regard.) (Zierk, Marsha)
October 19, 2018 Filing 44 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Philip G. Cormier and Syrie Fried terminated. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 18, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Roger Knox.(Cormier, Philip)
October 18, 2018 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief : Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Maynard, Timothy)
October 18, 2018 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief : Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Maynard, Timothy)
October 17, 2018 Filing 40 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying #25 without prejudice Motion to modify TRO to permit defendant to pay legal fee expenses. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 16, 2018 Filing 39 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #32 Motion for Modification to the existing temporary restraining Order (TRO) with regard to defendant Roger Knox as agreed to by the SEC and Knox. See Dkt #32. Knox's obligations pursuant to Sections IX and XIII of the TRO be extended to October 22, 2018, with the exception that Knox must provide the SEC with a written list of all "bank accounts, brokerage accounts, investments, business interests, loans, lines of credit, and real and personal property wherever situated," and the location of any funds or other assets by October 15, 2018. See Dkt. No. 9, at IX.1, IX.6, and IX.7; and Knox's obligations pursuant to Section X of the TRO be extended to October 25, 2018. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 15, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Roger Knox . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit to Criminal Complaint)(Cormier, Philip)
October 15, 2018 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief : Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Maynard, Timothy)
October 15, 2018 Filing 36 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Temporary Restraining Order enter on October 2, 2018, [Dkt #9], is extended and remains in full force and effect until this court can hear the Security and Exchange Commission's motion for preliminary injunction [Dkt #34] and enter a ruling. The Clerk will set a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction for October 30, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21.(Zierk, Marsha)
October 11, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Israel, Rebecca)
October 11, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Asset Freeze, and Order for Other Equitable Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Israel, Rebecca)
October 11, 2018 Filing 33 Opposition re #25 MOTION re #9 Order Modification of Temporary Restraining Order as to Roger Knox filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Forni, Eric)
October 11, 2018 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Modify THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS TO ROGER KNOX by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Forni, Eric)
October 10, 2018 Filing 30 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Motion to Seal Document. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 9, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal Document by Roger Knox.(Cormier, Philip)
October 9, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wintercap SA served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Shields, Kathleen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed Roger Knox served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Shields, Kathleen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Burdette Shields on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Shields, Kathleen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION re #9 Order Modification of Temporary Restraining Order by Roger Knox. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cormier, Philip)
October 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip G. Cormier on behalf of Roger Knox (Cormier, Philip)
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Syrie D. Fried on behalf of Roger Knox (Fried, Syrie)
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wintercap SA Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed C Capital Corp served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed WB21 NA Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed B2 Cap Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed WB21 US Inc served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed B21 Ltd. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Simone Gastauer Foehr served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Raimund Gastauer served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Silverton SA Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael T. Gastauer served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Forni, Eric)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion to Unseal Case. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Unseal Case by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to B2 Cap Inc., C Capital Corp, Michael T. Gastauer, Roger Knox, Silverton SA Inc., WB21 NA Inc., WB21 US Inc, Wintercap SA, Wintercap SA Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered ALLOWING #3 Emergency Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Order Freezing Assets and Order for other Equitable Relief filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion to Seal Case (Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Case by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Order re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order submitted by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Trevor T. Donelan re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Order Freezing Assets and Order for other Equitable Relief by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Rynne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rynne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Knox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB21 US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Gastauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintercap SA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverton SA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B2 Cap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Knox
Represented By: Philip G. Cormier
Represented By: Syrie D. Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintercap SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Capital Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB21 NA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simone Gastauer Foehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raimund Gastauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B21 Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB21 DMCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamal Internaional FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Eric A. Forni
Represented By: Martin F Healey
Represented By: Jonathan R. Allen
Represented By: David M. Scheffler
Represented By: J. Lauchlan Wash
Represented By: Kathleen Burdette Shields
Represented By: Amy Gwiazda
Represented By: Rebecca Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?