In Re. Spenlinhauer et al
Appellant: Robert J. Spenlinhauer
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Appellee: Lynne Riley
Case Number: 1:2018cv12101
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM OF DECISION entered. See Order for more details.Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ, 1:18-cv-12101-RWZ(Urso, Lisa)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal held on 10/23/2018. Judge hears counsel and takes under advisement; plaintiff in one week to file what remains; 2 weeks defendant; (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cruickshank, Koha, Morrier & Bednar) Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ, 1:18-cv-10829-RWZ, 1:18-cv-12101-RWZ(Urso, Lisa)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Hearing REset for 10/23/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ, 1:18-cv-10829-RWZ, 1:18-cv-12101-RWZ(Urso, Lisa)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (28) Motion to reschedule oral argument in case 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ, 1:18-cv-10829-RWZ, 1:18-cv-12101-RWZ(Urso, Lisa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing set for 10/24/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ, 1:18-cv-10829-RWZ, 1:18-cv-12101-RWZ(Urso, Lisa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (24) Motion for Hearing in case 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-10495-RWZ, 1:18-cv-10829-RWZ, 1:18-cv-12101-RWZ(Urso, Lisa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel added. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-17191. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Spenlinhauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert J. Spenlinhauer
Represented By: Gary W. Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Fitzgerald
Represented By: Eric K. Bradford
Represented By: Paula R.C. Bachtell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lynne Riley
Represented By: John T. Morrier
Represented By: David Koha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?