Omer et al v. Qatar Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Fatima Omer, Mandar Adem and Qatar Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv12114
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 31, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Paine, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 31, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Qatar Airways Corporation.(Lavoie, Mark)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Qatar Airways Corporation served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Conley, J.)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Mandar Adem, Fatima Omer. (Conley, J.) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/11/2018) (Paine, Matthew).
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Qatar Airways Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Qatar Airways Corporation Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7357317 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fatima Omer, Mandar Adem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Defendant)(Conley, J.) Modified docket text on 10/10/2018 (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omer et al v. Qatar Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Omer
Represented By: J. Michael Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandar Adem
Represented By: J. Michael Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qatar Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?