Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. v. Durgin
Plaintiff: Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Patrick Durgin
Case Number: 1:2018cv12121
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: STANDING ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFAULT issued as to Michael Patrick Durgin. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles A. Wood, Jr.)(Wood, Charles)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Patrick Durgin served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Wood, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Michael Patrick Durgin. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. in re #1 Complaint,. (Wood, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ameriprise Financial, Inc. for Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc... (Wood, Charles)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Confirm Arbitration Award against Michael Patrick Durgin Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7358777 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form U4, #2 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. v. Durgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Patrick Durgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?