Mcintyre v. RentGrow Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Mcintyre
Defendant: RentGrow Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12141
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John Soumilas. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James A. Francis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Soumilas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7439391 by Patricia Mcintyre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH)(Lefebvre, Christopher)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James A. Francis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7439356 by Patricia Mcintyre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff in Support of PVH)(Lefebvre, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed RentGrow Inc. served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Lefebvre, Christopher)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to 12/13/18 to respond to complaint. (Folan, Karen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by RentGrow Inc..(Frankel, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RentGrow Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RentGrow Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7363337 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by RentGrow Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lefebvre, Christopher) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #2 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 10/12/2018 to attach complaint and flatten pdfs (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcintyre v. RentGrow Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RentGrow Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mcintyre
Represented By: Christopher M. Lefebvre
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: John Soumilas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?