Mabry v. Harmon Law Offices P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Mabry
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N A and Harmon Law Offices P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12155
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 Copy re 19 Set Deadlines, 18 Order on Motion to Stay, mailed to Jesse Mabry on 11/26/2018 (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/3/2019 (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. #17 , Joint Motion to Stay Litigation until December 28, 2018, allowed. Parties shall file a joint status report by Thursday, January 3 informing the court of the status of the case. (Belmont, Kellyann)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A.(George, Wayne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 COPY re #15 ORDER ENTERED. MAILED TO : Jesse Mabry 117 Healey Terrace Brockton, MA 02301 on 11/7/2018. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER re MOTION FOR RESTRAINING ORDER as to Amended Complaint : " The Motion for TRO is denied because Plaintiff has not produced evidence demonstrating a likelihood of success". (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Against Harmon Law Offices, P.C. filed by Harmon Law Offices P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint)(O'Leary, Edward)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Against Harmon Law Offices, P.C. by Harmon Law Offices P.C..(O'Leary, Edward)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harmon Law Offices P.C.. (O'Leary, Edward)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward P. O'Leary on behalf of Harmon Law Offices P.C. (O'Leary, Edward)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (George, Wayne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (George, Wayne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint)(George, Wayne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A.(George, Wayne)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Request for a TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint)(George, Wayne) Modified docket text on 11/7/2018 in accordance with pleading filed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered..... REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley Referred for: Full Pretrial, Case Mgmt, and for an R&R on Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Danieli, Chris)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7366808 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(George, Wayne) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/16/2018) (Danieli, Chris). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/16/2018) (Danieli, Chris).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabry v. Harmon Law Offices P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Mabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N A
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon Law Offices P.C.
Represented By: Edward P. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?