U.S. Bank Trust N.A. v. Giles et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A.
Defendant: Bruno Giles and Lynda Eunice Giles
Interested Party: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Household Finance Corporation II, GN Mortgage Corporation, Middlesex Savings Bank and Town and Country Credit Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12173
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by U.S. Bank Trust N.A. (Linehan, Brian)
December 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed GN Mortgage Corporation served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Linehan, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Linehan, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lynda Eunice Giles served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Linehan, Brian)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bruno Giles served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018; Middlesex Savings Bank served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Linehan, Brian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bruno Giles, Lynda Eunice Giles. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Manolakis, Ashley)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust. (Linehan, Brian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Bruno Giles, Lynda Eunice Giles Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7370489 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #3 Civil Cover Sheet , #4 Category Form , #5 Exhibit A , #6 Exhibit B , #7 Exhibit C , #8 Exhibit D , #9 Exhibit E , #10 Exhibit E1 , #11 Exhibit F , #12 Exhibit G , #13 Exhibit H , #14 Exhibit I , #15 Exhibit I1 , #16 Exhibit J , #17 Exhibit J1 , #18 Exhibit K , #19 Exhibit L , #20 Exhibit M , #21 Exhibit N , #22 Exhibit O , #23 Exhibit P , #24 Exhibit Q , #25 Exhibit R , #26 Exhibit S) (Linehan, Brian). (Attachments of exhibits deleted and re-attached in order to separate them on 10/18/2018. (Manolakis, Ashley).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. v. Giles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A.
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Household Finance Corporation II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GN Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Middlesex Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Town and Country Credit Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruno Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Eunice Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?