Atlantic Recording Corporation v. Does 1-100 et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100, XYZ Company and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2018cv12197
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 17 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Urso, Lisa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/31/2018. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Oliverio) (Urso, Lisa)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order of Robert Suchan by Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service)(Oliverio, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST071066 for monies received on 10/25/2018 in amount of $ 1000.00, re: #11 Order on Motion for TRO. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 10/31/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for TRO (Urso, Lisa)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, XYZ Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Oliverio, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Oliverio, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Michael Lawrence Oliverio on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation filed by on behalf of Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prior MA Order, #2 Exhibit B - Prior MA Orders, #3 Exhibit C - Prior Other Orders)(Oliverio, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue of Robert Suchan by Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Concert Dates)(Oliverio, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue filed by Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Oliverio, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Atlantic Recording Corporation of Related Cases (Oliverio, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7376126 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Atlantic Recording Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Catagory Sheet)(Oliverio, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Recording Corporation v. Does 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?