Royce-George & Associates, LLC v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Royce-George & Associates, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12198
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Folan, Karen)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., filed by Royce-George & Associates, LLC.(McDonagh, Christina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #1 Exhibits (FIled Under Seal)) (McDonagh, Christina).
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fialkow, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Fialkow, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Reserve and Security Agreement))(Fialkow, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fialkow, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hollee M. Watson on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Watson, Hollee)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to 12/5/18 to respond to complaint. (Folan, Karen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 5, 2018 to Respond to Complaint by U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fialkow, David)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 1BST071050 for #1 Complaint (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., filed by Royce-George & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Se Complaint Form, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Danieli, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royce-George & Associates, LLC v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Represented By: Hollee M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Represented By: Hollee M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royce-George & Associates, LLC
Represented By: John A. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?