U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. Hilse et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Defendant: TD Bank National Association, Santander Bank N.A. and Doreen C. Hilse
Case Number: 1:2018cv12226
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed TD Bank National Association served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Linehan, Brian)
December 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Santander Bank N.A. served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Linehan, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Doreen C. Hilse served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Linehan, Brian)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Doreen C. Hilse, Santander Bank N.A., TD Bank National Association. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Siebert, Erik)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Linehan, Brian)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7380313 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Linehan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. Hilse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen C. Hilse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?