Depina v. Sessions et al
Petitioner: Jarcial Depina
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello, Sup. Steven Souza, Jefferson Sessions, Thomas M. Hodgson, Mr. Todd Lyons and Elaine Duke
Case Number: 1:2018cv12248
Filed: October 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Elaine Duke. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Plaintiff's Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #10 Defendant's MOTION To Dismiss. Response due by 1/10/2019. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/10/19 to File Response/Reply Habeas by Jarcial Depina.(Church, Susan)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Steven Souza. (Piemonte, Eve)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Souza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 BIA Decision)(Piemonte, Eve)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven Souza.(Piemonte, Eve)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jarcial Depina.. (Church, Susan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
October 30, 2018 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $5.00 paid on 10/28/2018, receipt number 0101-7384421. (Tran, Henry)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later than 21 days from receipt of this order.(PSSA, 5)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 2 corrected because: service order entered in wrong matter. No service order has entered in this action. (PSSA, 5)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (PSSA, 5)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Entry Error
October 28, 2018 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7384424 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Jarcial Depina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Form)(Church, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depina v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jarcial Depina
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sup. Steven Souza
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas M. Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elaine Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?