Pierson v. Middleboro Restaurants, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kristen Pierson
Defendant: Middleboro Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Barrett's Fireside Grille and Middleboro Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12268
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Cowley, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Middleboro Restaurants, Inc..(Kenney, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to 12/10/2018 to Respond to Complaint. (York, Steve)
November 24, 2018 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/10/2018 to Respond to Complaint by Middleboro Restaurants, Inc..(Kenney, Thomas)
November 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kenney on behalf of Middleboro Restaurants, Inc. (Kenney, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Harrison on behalf of Kristen Pierson (Harrison, Bryan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Kristen Pierson. Middleboro Restaurants, Inc. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Kristen Pierson. (Cowley, Steven)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Middleboro Restaurants, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing of copyright case. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Middleboro Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Barrett's Fireside Grille Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7388321 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kristen Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form, #6 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT)(Cowley, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. Middleboro Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Pierson
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Represented By: Bryan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middleboro Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Barrett's Fireside Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middleboro Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?