Taylor v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor, Jr.
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv12286
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered setting pretrial schedule. An Answer having been filed in this case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule.Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) will be completed by 1/4/19; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties are due by 1/31/19; All fact discovery to be completed by 4/29/19; dispositive motions will be filed by 5/22/19, with any opposition by 6/12/19, reply only with leave of court. If the parties intend to utilize experts, they will inform the court by 2/22/19, so that it can amend the pretrial schedule. If both parties are interested in mediation and would like to participate in the federal courts program, they will inform the session clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 2/25/19.(Zierk, Marsha)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A..(Pisano, Vanessa)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint up to and including December 7, 2018. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A..(Pisano, Vanessa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Treating the stipulation filed on November 19, 2018, as a motion by defendants to extend time to respond to the Complaint. Parties are required to seek approval from the court by way of a motion for any alteration of the time prescribed by the federal rules of civil procedure. Moreover, the defendants have failed to provide any basis for the extension. Therefore, the motion is DENIED, without prejudice to refiling.(Zierk, Marsha)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Pisano, Vanessa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Pisano, Vanessa)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Pisano, Vanessa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura K. McKelvey on behalf of Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. (McKelvey, Maura)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa V. Pisano on behalf of Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. (Pisano, Vanessa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (McKillop, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7394420 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Pisano, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Vanessa V. Pisano
Represented By: Maura K. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundpoint Mortgage Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Vanessa V. Pisano
Represented By: Maura K. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?