RI Property Wire, LLC v. Linnell et al
Plaintiff: RI Property Wire, LLC
Defendant: Scott A Linnell and Theresa L. Linnell
Cross Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12297
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #14 Opposition to Motion, #15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by December 12, 2018. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service filed by RI Property Wire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Masterson, Shawn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service filed by RI Property Wire, LLC. (Masterson, Shawn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by December 5, 2018. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Halley, Taylor)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6)(McCann, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Note, #2 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Assignment, #4 Exhibit D-Foreclosure Deed, #5 Exhibit E-Foreclosure Affidavit, #6 Exhibit F-Auction Sale Contact, #7 Exhibit G-Occupied Property Addendum, #8 Exhibit H-Quitclaim Deed)(McCann, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP.(McCann, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (FDS, law3)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M. Masterson on behalf of RI Property Wire, LLC (Masterson, Shawn)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 23, 2018 to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Cross-Claim Complaint by Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP.(McCann, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (McKillop, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP.. (McCann, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7394766 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B-Quitclaim Deed, #3 Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCann, John) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/2/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/2/2018) (McKillop, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RI Property Wire, LLC v. Linnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Linnell
Represented By: Alex R. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa L. Linnell
Represented By: Alex R. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Bank of America, N.A. Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: John H. McCann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: John H. McCann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RI Property Wire, LLC
Represented By: Shawn M. Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?