Gelineau et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Gelineau and James W. Gelineau
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWABS 2004-05
Case Number: 1:2018cv12317
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWABS 2004-05. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stephens, Christian)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWABS 2004-05.(Stephens, Christian)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including December 26, 2018, to respond to the complaint. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 26, 2018 to Respond to Complaint by The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWABS 2004-05.(Stephens, Christian)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Kaplan on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWABS 2004-05 (Kaplan, Harrison)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT Record. (Stephens, Christian)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWABS 2004-05 ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7397932 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Property Card, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Superior Court re: Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Stephens, Christian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/8/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 11/8/2018 to correct upside down pages (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gelineau et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Gelineau
Represented By: Mark Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Gelineau
Represented By: Mark Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWABS 2004-05
Represented By: Christian B.W. Stephens
Represented By: Harrison J. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?