Benjamin Wasson v. LogMeIn, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin Wasson
Defendant: William R. Wagner, Edward K. Herdiech and Logmein, Inc.
Petitioner: Larry Pollock, Robert Daub, Doug Van Riper and June Little
Case Number: 1:2018cv12330
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Referring Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 50 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert V. Prongay. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 18, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert V. Prongay Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7460501 by Benjamin Wasson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Robert V. Prongay ISO Motion for Leave to Appear PHV)(Leviton, Jason)
December 10, 2018 Filing 48 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. Order Appointing Lead Plaintiffs and Counsel re #25 filed by Larry Pollock, Robert Daub (McDonagh, Christina)
December 7, 2018 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING #46 Stipulation filed by Edward K. Herdiech, Logmein, Inc., William R. Wagner (Folan, Karen)
December 7, 2018 Filing 46 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule by Edward K. Herdiech, Logmein, Inc., William R. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trach, William)
December 6, 2018 Filing 45 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian T. Glennon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 6, 2018 Filing 44 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeff G. Hammel. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 5, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian T. Glennon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7440627 by Edward K. Herdiech, Logmein, Inc., William R. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brian T. Glennon)(Trach, William)
December 5, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeff G. Hammel Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7440616 by Edward K. Herdiech, Logmein, Inc., William R. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeff G. Hammel)(Trach, William)
December 5, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Trach on behalf of Edward K. Herdiech, Logmein, Inc., William R. Wagner (Trach, William)
November 16, 2018 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
November 16, 2018 Filing 39 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Leviton, Jason)
November 13, 2018 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
November 6, 2018 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07285.
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #13 MOTION to Transfer Case. For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that transferring this case will better serve the interests of justice and the convenience of the parties and witnesses. Transfer under 1404(a) is therefore appropriate. As a result, the Court hereby orders the Clerk to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Case electronically transferred on 11/5/2018. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mrgo)
November 1, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #25 filed by Movants Robert Daub, Larry Pollock. (Portnoy, Lesley)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court for the District of Massachusetts #13 currently set for hearing on November 5, 2018 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Stephen M. Shepardson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Benjamin Wasson, designating Laurence M. Rosen as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 29, 2018 Filing 31 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #21 filed by Movant June Little. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 30 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen M. Shepardson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Wasson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22653134) filed by plaintiff Benjamin Wasson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order G-64 Order) (Rosen, Laurence)
October 22, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court for the District of Massachusetts #13 filed by Defendants Edward K. Herdiech, LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner. (Glennon, Brian)
October 22, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #17 filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Doug Van Riper. (Rosen, Laurence)
October 19, 2018 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #25 filed by Movants Robert Daub, Larry Pollock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - GPM Firm Resume)(Portnoy, Lesley)
October 19, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #25 filed by Movants Robert Daub, Larry Pollock. (Portnoy, Lesley)
October 19, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Movants Larry Pollock, Robert Daub. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Lesley F Portnoy added to party Larry Pollock(pty:mov), Attorney Lesley F Portnoy added to party Robert Daub(pty:mov)) (Portnoy, Lesley)
October 19, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant June Little, (Pafiti, Jennifer)
October 19, 2018 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Jennifer Pafiti in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF JUNE LITTLE FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #21 filed by Movant June Little. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Pafiti, Jennifer)
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF JUNE LITTLE FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL #21 filed by Movant June Little. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION OF JUNE LITTLE FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL filed by Movant June Little. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party June Little(pty:bkmov)) (Pafiti, Jennifer)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Doug Van Riper, (Rosen, Laurence)
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Laurence M. Rosen In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff #17 filed by Movant Doug Van Riper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rosen, Laurence)
October 19, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff #17 filed by Movant Doug Van Riper. (Rosen, Laurence)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Doug Van Riper. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Doug Van Riper(pty:mov)) (Rosen, Laurence)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Laurence M. Rosen in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court for the District of Massachusetts #13 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wasson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Street Order)(Rosen, Laurence)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court for the District of Massachusetts #13 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wasson. (Rosen, Laurence)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Hammel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants LogMein, Inc., William R. Wagner and Edward K. Herdiech, designating Brian T. Glennon as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District Court for the District of Massachusetts filed by Defendants Edward K. Herdiech, LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jo Deal in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order) (Glennon, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant LogMeIn, Inc. identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Glennon, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Edward K. Herdiech, LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner, (Glennon, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Hammel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Edward K. Herdiech, LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22535618) filed by Defendants Edward K. Herdiech, LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Glennon, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian T Glennon counsel for Defendants Edward K. Herdiech, LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner. Adding Brian T. Glennon as counsel of record for LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner and Edward K. Herdiech for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner and Edward K. Herdiech. (Attorney Brian T Glennon added to party Edward K. Herdiech(pty:dft), Attorney Brian T Glennon added to party LogMeIn, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian T Glennon added to party William R. Wagner(pty:dft))(Glennon, Brian)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Edward K. Herdiech, LogMeIn, Inc., William R. Wagner. (car)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wasson, (Rosen, Laurence)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wasson. (Rosen, Laurence)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wasson. (Rosen, Laurence)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22279125 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wasson. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification) (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Benjamin Wasson(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin Wasson v. LogMeIn, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Wagner
Represented By: Jeff G Hammel
Represented By: Brian T Glennon
Represented By: William J. Trach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward K. Herdiech
Represented By: Jeff G Hammel
Represented By: Brian T Glennon
Represented By: William J. Trach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logmein, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff G Hammel
Represented By: Brian T Glennon
Represented By: William J. Trach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Pollock
Represented By: Lesley F Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Daub
Represented By: Lesley F Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doug Van Riper
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: June Little
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Wasson
Represented By: Stephen M Shepardson
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Represented By: Robert V. Prongay
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?