Conning v. Halpern et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Scott Conning
Defendant: Jack Halpern and CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12336
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Scott Conning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Scott Conning and Exhibits)(Parker, Kenneth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING #15 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Andrew Scott Conning (Folan, Karen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Andrew Scott Conning. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Counsel in Support of Response to Show Cause Order)(Lichtin, Nathaniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On November 20, 2018, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2). [ECF No. #8 ]. Plaintiff had 14 days to oppose the motion per Local Rule 7.1(b)(2). Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to oppose the motion. Any opposition to the motion to dismiss must be filed by December 14, 2018, or the motion will be granted as unopposed.(McDonagh, Christina)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Carnathan, Sean)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara J. Myslinski on behalf of CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern (Myslinski, Tara)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Carnathan, Sean)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carnathan, Sean)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern of Special Appearance (Carnathan, Sean)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Carnathan, Sean)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Andrew Scott Conning. Acknowledgement filed by Andrew Scott Conning. (Lichtin, Nathaniel)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT Record CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc. summons served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018; Jack Halpern summons served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018.. (Carnathan, Sean)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Jones, Sherry)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7401701 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carnathan, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conning v. Halpern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Halpern
Represented By: Sean T. Carnathan
Represented By: Tara J. Myslinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Sean T. Carnathan
Represented By: Tara J. Myslinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Scott Conning
Represented By: Nathaniel J. Lichtin
Represented By: Kenneth R. L. Parker
Represented By: Shaun P. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?