Miller v. Sonus Networks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ron Miller
Defendant: Mark T Greenquist, Raymond P. Dolan, Sonus Networks, Inc. and Michael Swade
Case Number: 1:2018cv12344
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Regarding Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead) by Raymond P. Dolan, Mark T Greenquist, Sonus Networks, Inc., Michael Swade. (Provazza, Stephen)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Nicholas Provazza on behalf of Raymond P. Dolan, Mark T Greenquist, Sonus Networks, Inc., Michael Swade (Provazza, Stephen)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Ron Miller. Sonus Networks, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Ron Miller. (Andrews, Daryl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Raymond P. Dolan, Mark T Greenquist, Sonus Networks, Inc., Michael Swade. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7404422 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ron Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Daryl) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/8/2018) to flatten out the file (Vieira, Leonardo). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #3 Category Sheet) (Vieira, Leonardo). Modified on 11/8/2018 (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Sonus Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T Greenquist
Represented By: Stephen Nicholas Provazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond P. Dolan
Represented By: Stephen Nicholas Provazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonus Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Nicholas Provazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Swade
Represented By: Stephen Nicholas Provazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Miller
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?