The Republic of Poland v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: The Republic of Poland
Defendant: Schooner Capital LLC, Atlantic Investment Partners LLC and Vincent J Ryan
Case Number: 1:2018cv12382
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Michael A. Losco. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Alexandre de Gramont. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael A. Losco Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7482872 by The Republic of Poland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Losco in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 [Petitioners Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Losco)(Blank, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandre de Gramont Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7482868 by The Republic of Poland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandre de Gramont in Support of Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 [Petitioners Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexandre De Gramont)(Blank, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented-To Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Daniel Tan and Paul Barker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schooner Capital LLC. (Wilkins, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic Investment Partners LLC. (Wilkins, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel Tan and Paul Barker Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7481465 by Atlantic Investment Partners LLC, Vincent J Ryan, Schooner Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Daniel Tan, #2 Affidavit Paul Barker)(Wilkins, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Page Wilkins on behalf of Atlantic Investment Partners LLC, Vincent J Ryan, Schooner Capital LLC (Wilkins, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Republic of Poland. Schooner Capital LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Blank, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Republic of Poland. Atlantic Investment Partners LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Blank, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Republic of Poland. Vincent J Ryan waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Blank, Timothy)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Atlantic Investment Partners LLC, Vincent J Ryan, Schooner Capital LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Siebert, Erik)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint, (Declaration of Alexandre de Gramont) by The Republic of Poland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Recognize and Enforce Arbitration Award against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7412036 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The Republic of Poland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form 9-2018)(Blank, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Republic of Poland v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schooner Capital LLC
Represented By: Daniel Tan
Represented By: Paul Barker
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Investment Partners LLC
Represented By: Daniel Tan
Represented By: Paul Barker
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J Ryan
Represented By: Daniel Tan
Represented By: Paul Barker
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Republic of Poland
Represented By: Timothy C. Blank
Represented By: Michael A. Losco
Represented By: Alexandre de Gramont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?