Town of Danvers Electric Division v. Elster Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Town of Danvers Electric Division
Defendant: Elster Solutions, LLC and Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12386
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Town of Danvers Electric Division. (Ecker, Deborah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Town of Danvers Electric Division. Honeywell International, Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Ecker, Deborah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Town of Danvers Electric Division. Elster Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Ecker, Deborah)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Elster Solutions, LLC, Honeywell International, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Siebert, Erik)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7413873 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Danvers Electric Division. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ecker, Deborah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #2 Supplement Category Form) (Siebert, Erik).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Danvers Electric Division v. Elster Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Danvers Electric Division
Represented By: Deborah I. Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elster Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?