Mullane v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Mullane
Defendant: A Medium Corporation and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv12412
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Catherine M. Baiocchi. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 1/22/2019) by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Menapace, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Catherine M. Baiocchi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7484416 by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Menapace, Michael)
December 24, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by A Medium Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply)(Booth, Daniel)
December 24, 2018 Filing 24 Opposition re #16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Request for Sanctions filed by A Medium Corporation. (Booth, Daniel)
December 24, 2018 Filing 23 Opposition re #15 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 Request for Judicial Notice filed by A Medium Corporation. (Booth, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to January 9, 2019 to Serve a Responsive Pleading (McKillop, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #11 Motion for Entry of Default (McKillop, Matthew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 STATE COURT Record. (McKillop, Matthew)
December 13, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #18 MOTION to Strike, #15 MOTION to Strike filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McKillop, Matthew)
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #13 Opposition to Motion by Jonathan Mullane.(McKillop, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(McKillop, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Record for Defendant A Medium Corporation by Jonathan Mullane.(McKillop, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 Request for Judicial Notice by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKillop, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/11/2018) (McKillop, Matthew).
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McKillop, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Opposition re #11 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Menapace, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice by A Medium Corporation. (Booth, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McKillop, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A Medium Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Mullane letter 10/5/18), #2 Exhibit B (Medium letter 10/25/18), #3 Exhibit C (Mullane mail 10/25/18), #4 Exhibit D (Medium letter 10/29/18), #5 Exhibit E (Mullane email 10/30/18), #6 Exhibit F (Medium letter 10/31/18), #7 Exhibit G (Medium Rules), #8 Exhibit H (Florida Hearing Transcript), #9 Exhibit I (BrokerCheck Report), #10 Exhibit J (Summonses Filed in State Court Before Removal), #11 Memorandum of Law in Support, #12 Declaration of Dan Booth, #13 Declaration of Alex Feerst)(Booth, Daniel)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Opposition re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 9, 2019 to Serve a Responsive Pleading filed by Jonathan Mullane. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 9, 2019 to Serve a Responsive Pleading by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Menapace, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., a Swiss Corp., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Menapace, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Menapace on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company (Menapace, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kinsella, Devan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A Medium Corporation. (Booth, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Booth on behalf of A Medium Corporation (Booth, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A Medium Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7419085 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons), #3 Exhibit C (Consent to Removal), #4 Affidavit Declaration of Dan Booth, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Booth, Daniel) (Attachments 5 & 6 replaced on 11/20/2018 to correct fillable PDF format) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullane v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mullane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Medium Corporation
Represented By: Daniel G. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Catherine M. Baiocchi
Represented By: Michael Menapace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?