Zagerella v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Zagerella
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and U.S. Bank Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv12414
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 19, 2019 (to submit a Joint Statement) and to February 25, 2019 (to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference) to File Joint Statement Pursuant to Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1 and to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust.(O'Neill, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust to #5 Notice (Other). (O'Neill, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust re #1 Notice of Removal, AMENDED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(O'Neill, Thomas)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Verified) and Affirmative Defenses by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust.(O'Neill, Thomas)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Pulaski, Andraya)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kinsella, Devan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #1 Notice of Removal, Motion Pending In The State Court Requiring The Attention Of This Court (O'Neill, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.. (O'Neill, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC for Caliber Home Loans, Inc... (O'Neill, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andraya B. Pulaski on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Pulaski, Andraya)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7419143 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Form)(O'Neill, Thomas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zagerella v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Zagerella
Represented By: Neil J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. O'Neill
Represented By: Andraya B. Pulaski
Represented By: Andraya Pulaski Brunau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Thomas J. O'Neill
Represented By: Andraya B. Pulaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust
Represented By: Thomas J. O'Neill
Represented By: Andraya Pulaski Brunau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?