Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc. v. NIELSEN et al
Plaintiff: Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc.
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN, Kirsten M Nielsen and Laura B. Zuchowski
Case Number: 1:2018cv12428
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting #9 Motion to Stay (Bono, Christine)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Stay All Deadlines in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by Kirsten M Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski.(Weida, Jason)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Weida on behalf of Kirsten M Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski (Weida, Jason)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc.. (Drago, Anthony)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc.. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Drago, Anthony)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kirsten M Nielsen, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Laura B. Zuchowski. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7421574 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Drago, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc. v. NIELSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leers Weinzapfel Associates Architects, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Drago, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Laura B. Zuchowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten M Nielsen
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura B. Zuchowski
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?