Noor v. Sessions et al

Petitioner: Mohamed H. Noor
Respondent: Jeff Sessions, Antone Moniz and C.M. Cronen
Case Number: 1:2018cv12434
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
0 Judge: Judith G Dein
1 Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Plaintiff. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 21, 2018 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (adminn, )
December 19, 2018 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Mootness) by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kanwit, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 5 PLEASE DISREGARD -- DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE -- Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Elaine Duke. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) Modified on 12/19/2018 (Dambrosio, Jolyne).
December 7, 2018 4 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition on (1) Respondent C.M. Cronen, the Field Director of ICEs Boston Field Office; and (2) the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts.Respondent Cronen shall, no later than Wednesday, December 19, 2018, inform the Court whether Noor has been removed. If Noor has not been removed, Respondent shall inform the Court of Noors present location and whether his removal is scheduled. At this time, Respondent Cronen is not required to otherwise respond to the petition.(PSSA, 3)
November 21, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 21, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Mohamed H. Noor.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noor v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohamed H. Noor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C.M. Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?