KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC. et al v. Harvard University et al
Plaintiff: SIGMA CHI, John Doe 3, KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA and KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC.
Defendant: President and Fellows of Harvard College and Harvard University
Case Number: 1:2018cv12485
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 28 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to February 8, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 8, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by President and Fellows of Harvard College.(Braceras, Roberto)
January 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwina Bullard Clarke on behalf of President and Fellows of Harvard College (Clarke, Edwina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 25 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered Plaintiffs' motion to permit the student plaintiffs to proceed under pseudonyms (Docket No. #6 ) is, subject to the above caveat, ALLOWED. Plaintiffs' motion for a protective order (Docket No. #6 ) is DENIED. So ordered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe 1, SIGMA CHI, John Doe 2, KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, John Doe 3, KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC., SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA. President and Fellows of Harvard College waiver sent on 12/3/2018, answer due 2/1/2019. (Jones, R.)
December 27, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO PERMIT STUDENT PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS MOTION for Protective Order TO PROTECT THEIR IDENTITIES, #21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC., KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA, SIGMA CHI. (Jones, R.)
December 27, 2018 Filing 22 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. Note - Replies must be filed separately and they should be filed as their own docket entry and not attached to a Motion (McDonagh, Christina)
December 22, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC., KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA, SIGMA CHI.(Freedman, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sara Shudofsky; Stanton Jones; Ada Anon; Andrew Tutt; Alexa Jones. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William M. Jay. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Freedman, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO PERMIT STUDENT PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS MOTION for Protective Order TO PROTECT THEIR IDENTITIES filed by Harvard University, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Braceras, Roberto)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harvard University, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Braceras, Roberto)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William M. Jay Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7458426 by Harvard University, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Braceras, Roberto)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J. Bone on behalf of Harvard University, President and Fellows of Harvard College (Bone, Joshua)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto M. Braceras on behalf of Harvard University, President and Fellows of Harvard College (Braceras, Roberto)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sara Shudofsky; Stanton Jones; Ada Anon; Andrew Tutt; Alexa Jones Filing fee: $ 500, receipt number 0101-7437072 by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC., KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA, SIGMA CHI. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Certification (Sara Shudofsky), #2 Pro Hac Vice Certification (Stanton Jones), #3 Pro Hac Vice Certification (Ada Anon), #4 Pro Hac Vice Certification (Andrew Tutt), #5 Pro Hac Vice Certification (Alexa Jones))(Freedman, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO PERMIT STUDENT PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS MOTION for Protective Order TO PROTECT THEIR IDENTITIES filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3. (Freedman, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO PERMIT STUDENT PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS , MOTION for Protective Order TO PROTECT THEIR IDENTITIES ( Responses due by 12/17/2018) by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Doe 1, #2 Declaration of John Doe 2, #3 Declaration of John Doe 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC., KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA CHI. (Freedman, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Harvard University, President and Fellows of Harvard College. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Freedman on behalf of John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC., KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA, SIGMA CHI (Freedman, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7435671 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC., KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON, SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA, SIGMA CHI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Freedman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC. et al v. Harvard University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIGMA CHI
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 3
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAPPA KAPPA GAMMA FRATERNITY
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIGMA ALPHA EPSILON - MASSACHUSETTS GAMMA
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAPPA ALPHA THETA FRATERNITY, INC.
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Sara L. Shudofsky
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Andrew T. Tutt
Represented By: Alexa D. Jones
Represented By: Ada V. Anon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President and Fellows of Harvard College
Represented By: William M. Jay
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Edwina Bullard Clarke
Represented By: Joshua J. Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard University
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Joshua J. Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?