Donovan et al v. Brava Electric & Telecom, Inc.

Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund, Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Michael P Donovan, Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan and Lawrence J. Bradley
Defendant: Brava Electric & Telecom, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12504
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 6 STATUS REPORT by Lawrence J. Bradley, Michael P Donovan, Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shea, Kathryn)
January 9, 2019 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Brava Electric & Telecom, Inc. served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Shea, Kathryn)
January 7, 2019 4 Letter/request (non-motion) from Defendant, Brava Electric & Telecom, Inc. re. payment made to Trust Fund Office and Financial Secretary's Office at I.B.E.W. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Montes, Mariliz)
December 6, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Brava Electric & Telecom, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
December 6, 2018 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7440621 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lawrence J. Bradley, Michael P Donovan, Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Local 103 IBEW, Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Shea, Kathryn) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/6/2018) (Montes, Mariliz). Modified on 12/6/2018 by converting 1-1 to pdf format (Montes, Mariliz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donovan et al v. Brava Electric & Telecom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Local 103 IBEW
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Deferred Income Fund, Local 103 IBEW
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P Donovan
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers' Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Bradley
Represented By: Kathryn S. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brava Electric & Telecom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?