Myers v. US Department of Justice et al

Plaintiff: Todd L. Myers
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation and US Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2018cv12569
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 Disc containing Photos received in Clerks Office and given to Chambers...filed by Todd L. Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 Letter/Evidentiary Supplement from Todd Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 Letter/Evidentiary Supplement from Todd Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 EXHIBIT (proof of service) re #16 MOTION for Hearing by Todd L. Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered denying #16 Motion for Hearing. (PSSA, 4)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT re #11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA by Todd L. Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION for Hearing filed by Todd L. Myers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McDonagh, Christina)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Hearing by Todd L. Myers.(McDonagh, Christina)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 Evidentiary Supplement Number Two filed by Todd L. Myers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (McDonagh, Christina)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 Evidentiary Supplement filed by Todd L. Myers. (Folan, Karen)
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered denying #5 , #7 Motions to Submit Evidence; denying as premature #12 Motion for Summary Judgment. [Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff on 12/31/2018.] (PSSA, 3)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Todd L. Myers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McDonagh, Christina)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd L. Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd L. Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 Letter re: submission of evidence on two CDs from Todd Myers. *Note both CDs have been received and have been brought to Chambers. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Todd Myers. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Submit Evidence by Todd L. Myers.(McDonagh, Christina)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, US Department of Justice. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Submit Evidence by Todd L. Myers.(McKillop, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM by Todd L. Myers in re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits Part 1, #3 Exhibits Part 2)(McKillop, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST071943 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, US Department of Justice, filed by Todd L. Myers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(McKillop, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. US Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd L. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?