Walsh v. Silver Lake Regional School District et al

Plaintiff: Debra Walsh
Defendant: Silver Lake Regional School District and Commonwealth of Masachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals
Case Number: 1:2018cv12576
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
January 30, 2019 Filing 28 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motions and Cancel Hearing, and withdrawing #8 & #9 Plaintiff's Motions to Remand and for Judgment. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
January 29, 2019 Filing 27 SEALED Administrative Record. (Attachments: #1 Volume II part 1, #2 Volume II part 2)(Caruso, Stephanie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw #8 MOTION to Remand, 19 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and CANCEL FEB 5th Hearing by Debra Walsh.(Richardson, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Richardson on behalf of Debra Walsh (Richardson, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward C. Cumbo on behalf of Debra Walsh (Cumbo, Edward)
January 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Commonwealth of Massachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals of the two volume Sealed Administrative Record (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Debra Walsh. (Quinn, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: #1 Cover Letter) (Caruso, Stephanie).
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 Joint Opposition re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Commonwealth of Masachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Silver Lake Regional School District. (Kaplan, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 Copy re 19 Notice of Hearing on Motion, mailed to Debra Walsh on 1/8/2019. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #8 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Plaintiff, Debra Walsh is to notify the Court if she wishes to appear by phone.(Caruso, Stephanie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion to Seal Administrative Record (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION to Seal Administrative Record by Commonwealth of Masachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Kaplan, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 DOCKET SHEET, Mailed to : Debra Walsh, 27 Meetinghouse Road, Kingston, MA 02364 on 1/7/2018. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 1/7/2019 to correct mailing address as to Plaintiff contact information. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Full Pretrial / Case Management and RR on Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Bell, Andrea)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Commonwealth of Masachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals. (Kaplan, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Silver Lake Regional School District. (Bell, Andrea)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Debra Walsh (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Debra Walsh. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Debra Walsh.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Commonwealth of Masachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Kaplan, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Kaplan on behalf of Commonwealth of Masachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals (Kaplan, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Silver Lake Regional School District.(Bell, Andrea)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by e-mail (McDonagh, Christina)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Silver Lake Regional School District ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7455052 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Simon, John) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/14/2018) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/14/2018) (McDonagh, Christina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Silver Lake Regional School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Walsh
Represented By: Robert L. Richardson
Represented By: Edward C. Cumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Lake Regional School District
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Andrea L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Masachusetts Bureau of Special Education Appeals
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?