Shore v. Voisin Consulting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Camille Shore
Defendant: Voisin Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12586
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 36 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting #35 Motion for Plaintiffs Counsel Atty Vaznaugh to appear by telephone on 2/27/19 at 9:30am Eastern Standard Time... Atty Vaznaugh shall be prepared to call into the court at 9:20am at the following telephone number 617-748-9789. (Molloy, Maryellen)
February 13, 2019 Filing 35 Assented to MOTION to appear telephonically by Camille Shore.(Vaznaugh, Richard)
February 8, 2019 Filing 34 FILING FEE/PAYMENT : $ 100.00, receipt number 1BST072847 for #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard J. Vaznaugh (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 8, 2019 Filing 33 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard J. Vaznaugh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard J. Vaznaugh by Camille Shore. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 25, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by Voisin Consulting, Inc..(Perlman, Cyrus)
January 2, 2019 Filing 30 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robin Samuel. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Billie D. Wenter. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robin Samuel Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7475641 by Voisin Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robin Samuel)(Perlman, Cyrus)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of 1 Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7475618 by Voisin Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Billie D. Wenter)(Perlman, Cyrus)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Cyrus M. Perlman on behalf of Voisin Consulting, Inc. (Perlman, Cyrus)
December 31, 2018 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of STATUS Hearing.... Initial Status Conference set for 2/27/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19, 7th Floor before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-06447.
December 13, 2018 case electronically transmitted to the District Court of Massachusetts. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Motion to Change Venue. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 21 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/3/2018 11:18:15 AM ]. File Size [ 12248 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:25:31 ]. (courtspeak).
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2018 re #9 MOTION to Change Venue. The matter is taken under submission. The Court will issue a written order.(FTR Time: 11:18-11:43.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Richard Vaznaugh. Attorney for Defendant: Billie Wenter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 Letter Brief re #18 Order - Notice of Authorities in Response to Questions from Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim filed by Camille Shore. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Vaznaugh, Richard) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/28/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Change Venue ) filed byVoisin Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nadine Ralph)(Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Changing Time of Motion Hearing: Notice is given that the hearing on the #9 MOTION to Change Venue set for 12/3/2018 will be held at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 OBJECTIONS to re #9 MOTION to Change Venue Objections to Declaration of Nadine Ralph by Camille Shore. (Kwan, Jason) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Camille Shore in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed byCamille Shore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Shore Decl.)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Kwan, Jason) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Change Venue ) filed byCamille Shore. (Kwan, Jason) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Camille Shore.. (Kwan, Jason) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/13/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Voisin Consulting, Inc... (Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Transfer Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Voisin Consulting, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nadine Ralph, #2 Proposed Order)(Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Voisin Consulting, Inc. of re #7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement du e by 1/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Voisin Consulting, Inc. of re 5 Case Assigned by Intake (Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons [Civil L.R. 3-15] filed by Voisin Consulting, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Voisin WW SAS, Other Affiliate Voisin Consulting SARL for Voisin Consulting, Inc.. (Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement [Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.11] filed by Voisin Consulting, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Voisin WW SAS for Voisin Consulting, Inc.. (Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Voisin Consulting, Inc. of re #1 Notice of Removal (Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18- 568113, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12782665). Filed by Voisin Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Nadine Ralph, #2 Declaration of Billie Wenter, #3 Exhibit A - Superior Court Summons, #4 Exhibit B - Superior Court Initial Complaint and Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit C - Superior Court Notice to Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit D - First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit E - Superior Court Docket, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 10/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shore v. Voisin Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Shore
Represented By: Jason Jun-Yuen Kwan
Represented By: Richard J. Vaznaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voisin Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Jonathan Samuel
Represented By: Billie Desiree Wenter
Represented By: Cyrus M. Perlman
Represented By: Robin J. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?