Mullane v. The United States of America,et.al.

Plaintiff: Jonathan Mullane
Defendant: Breaking Media, Inc., Federico A. Moreno, The United States of America and Elie Mystal
Case Number: 1:2018cv12618
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 37 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (ptd). Motions referred: #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #33 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 22, 2019 to File Answer, #16 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION to Substitute Party under the Westfall Act, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction All Claims Against the United States, #21 MOTION to Dismiss, #36 MOTION to Strike.(Lara, Miguel) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
February 13, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Strike #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint on behalf of the Hon. Federico A. Moreno and #34 Response by Jonathan Mullane. (Lara, Miguel)
February 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint on behalf of the Hon. Federico A. Moreno by The United States of America.(Weida, Jason)
February 11, 2019 Filing 34 Response by The United States of America to #32 Request for notice of default, . (Weida, Jason)
February 11, 2019 Filing 33 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 22, 2019 to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, #16 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION to Substitute Party under the Westfall Act, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction All Claims Against the United States, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion by The United States of America.(Weida, Jason)
February 6, 2019 Filing 32 Plaintiff's Application for: (1) An "Entry of Default" Pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.55(a); And (2) A "Default Judgment" Pursuant to F.R.CIV.P.55(b)(1) by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Lara, Miguel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Breaking Media, Inc., Elie Mystal. (Dickison, John)
January 31, 2019 Filing 30 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 29 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER LIFTING STAY(Lara, Miguel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Breaking Media, Inc., Elie Mystal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Dickison, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Elie Mystal served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Lara, Miguel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 26 Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Lara, Miguel) (Main Document 26 replaced on 1/23/2019 to reflect correct document) (Lara, Miguel).
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 Copy re #20 Order on Motion to Stay, #19 Order mailed to Jonathan Mullane 60 Clyde Street Unit # 1 Somerville, MA 02145 on 1/10/2019. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 9, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Dickison, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Dickison, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Breaking Media, Inc., Elie Mystal. (Dickison, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Breaking Media, Inc., Elie Mystal.(Dickison, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Endorsed ORDER entered " ALLOWED " re #17 Assented to MOTION to Stay All Deadlines As To The United States Of America In Light Of Lapse Of Appropriations. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 3, 2019 Filing 19 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER to Substitute Party (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #2 Motion to Substitute Party. Federico A. Moreno terminated (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION to Stay All Deadlines As To The United States Of America In Light Of Lapse Of Appropriations by The United States of America.(Weida, Jason)
December 31, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Filings by Substituted Defendant United States of America, Cross Motion to Re-Substitute Defendant Moreno, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Documents requested to strike: #2 MOTION to Substitute Party under the Westfall Act, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction All Claims Against the United States, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Document(s) submitted (Caruso, Stephanie)
December 31, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Elie Mystal. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. Issued by hand. (DeMaria, Timothy)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 (First ) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan Mullane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M.D. Segal on behalf of Breaking Media, Inc. (Segal, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Breaking Media, Inc.. (Dickison, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (adminn, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan P. Slean on behalf of Breaking Media, Inc. (Slean, Brendan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction All Claims Against the United States filed by The United States of America. (Weida, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction All Claims Against the United States by The United States of America.(Weida, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by The United States of America. (Weida, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Dickison on behalf of Breaking Media, Inc. (Dickison, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Document(s) submitted by The United States of America. Document received: Proposed Order of Substitution. (Weida, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party under the Westfall Act filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weida, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party under the Westfall Act by The United States of America.(Weida, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The United States of America ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Weida, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullane v. The United States of America,et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mullane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breaking Media, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Dickison
Represented By: Brendan P. Slean
Represented By: Joshua M.D. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico A. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie Mystal
Represented By: John Mark Dickison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?