Ali v. Nielson et al

Petitioner: Charles Samuel Ali
Respondent: Joseph McDonald, Jr., Kirstjen Nielson, Todd Lyons and Anton Moniz
Case Number: 1:2018cv12625
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 36 STATUS REPORT by Charles Samuel Ali. (Peachy, Jane)
February 11, 2019 Filing 35 ADDENDUM re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Anton Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Anita)
February 7, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 7, 2019 Filing 33 Transcript of Habeas Petition Hearing held on February 4, 2019, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 32 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denied as moot #25 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum (Paine, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 31 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 2/4/2019 re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Samuel Ali. The Court hears arguments of counsel and takes the matter under advisement. The Court enters an Order that the petitioner not be removed from the District of MA until further order of the Court. Such order will be entered once the Court is sufficiently satisfied as to this Court's jurisdiction or lack thereof. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Peachy and Barsky for the plaintiff, Ausa Johnson for the government) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 4, 2019 Filing 30 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #16 MOTION to Reset Deadline to January 31, 2019, for Response to His Motion to Dismiss (Paine, Matthew)
February 3, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Samuel Ali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Request Slips)(Peachy, Jane)
February 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Charles Samuel Ali.(Peachy, Jane)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Anton Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Anita)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Anton Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, Anita)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by Charles Samuel Ali.(Peachy, Jane)
February 1, 2019 Filing 24 ADDENDUM re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Samuel Ali. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney Amy Barsky)(Peachy, Jane)
January 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE PETITIONER (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Johnson, Anita) (Modified on 2/1/2019 to Correct Docket Text as Counsel Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Samuel Ali. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for TRO, #2 Affidavit Exh. 1 Affidavit of Charles Ali, #3 Affidavit Exh. 2 Affidavit of Jane Peachy, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Peachy, Jane)
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Charles Samuel Ali.(Peachy, Jane)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Barsky on behalf of Charles Samuel Ali (Barsky, Amy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to Reset Deadline to January 31, 2019, for Response to His Motion to Dismiss . (Johnson, Anita)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 Opposition re #16 MOTION to Reset Deadline to January 31, 2019, for Response to His Motion to Dismiss filed by Charles Samuel Ali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Order to Sudan, #2 Exhibit Birth Certificate)(Peachy, Jane) (Modified on 1/28/2019 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew).
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Reset Deadline to January 31, 2019, for Response to His Motion to Dismiss by Anton Moniz.(Johnson, Anita) (Modified on 1/28/2019 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Appointed Jane F. Peachy; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response due on or before 2/15/2019). The request for the petitioner to be released during this litigation is denied. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles Samuel Ali. (Paine, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Charles Samuel Ali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 3)(Paine, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Anton Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Johnson, Anita) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2019: #2 Exhibit) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Anton Moniz.(Johnson, Anita)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered denying #9 MOTION to Stay FOR 30 DAYS TO RESPOND TO PETITION IN LIGHT OF THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS. (Paine, Matthew)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay FOR 30 DAYS TO RESPOND TO PETITION IN LIGHT OF THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS by Anton Moniz.(Johnson, Anita)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Anton Moniz (Johnson, Anita)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. (PSSA, 5) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/21/2018) (PSSA, 5).
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Charles Samuel Ali (adminn, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (adminn, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST072049 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Charles Samuel Ali. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Vieira, Leonardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Nielson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anton Moniz
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Samuel Ali
Represented By: Amy Barsky
Represented By: Jane F. Peachy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?