Lifchits v. Integon National Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Pavel Lifchits
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Co. and Key 4U Transporation Corp. Bus
Case Number: 1:2018cv12637
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying #5 Motion for time to serve summons; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff must, within twenty-one days of the date of this order, show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for the reasons stated above. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the action. (PSSA, 4)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION regarding service of summons by Pavel Lifchits. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pavel Lifchits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kinsella, Devan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pavel Lifchits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1) (Kinsella, Devan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifchits v. Integon National Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key 4U Transporation Corp. Bus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pavel Lifchits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?