Revere Housing Authority v. Aparicio
Plaintiff: Revere Housing Authority
Defendant: Maricel Aparicio
Case Number: 1:2018cv12654
Filed: December 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Maricel Aparicio. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: HUD Mandated Grievance Hearing (Transcript), #2 Ex. B: Record of Administrative Proceedings, #3 Ex. C: Wait List for One Bedroom Unit)(Garick, Joshua)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 22, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court by Maricel Aparicio.(Garick, Joshua)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Costanzo on behalf of Revere Housing Authority (Costanzo, Nicole)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court ( Responses due by 2/8/2019) by Revere Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blake, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Blake on behalf of Revere Housing Authority (Blake, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Blake on behalf of Revere Housing Authority (Blake, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Disregard docket entry #10 Summons. Entry issued in error. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 [DISREGARD ISSUED IN ERROR] Summons Issued as to Revere Housing Authority. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pezzarossi, Lisa) Modified on 1/23/2019 (Pezzarossi, Lisa).
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maricel Aparicio. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(Garick, Joshua)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5)
January 5, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #3 Amended Document process, pleadings, and orders served on defendant in state court action by Maricel Aparicio. (Garick, Joshua)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 29, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Maricel Aparicio. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Garick, Joshua)
December 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and request to file affidavit in support, under seal by Maricel Aparicio.(Garick, Joshua)
December 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maricel Aparicio ( Fee Status: IFP requested) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Garick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revere Housing Authority v. Aparicio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revere Housing Authority
Represented By: Jeffrey T Blake
Represented By: Nicole Costanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricel Aparicio
Represented By: Joshua N. Garick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?