Abulzahab et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alie Soufan, Roy Gendron, Derek Thomas, Darcel Jackson, Darwin Mateo, Jairo Valdez, Vernon Hanberry, Wenjun Dou, Chafiq Belcaid, Willie Harrison, Aaron Jones, Rebecca Saber, Thomas Heelan, Yakup Cevik, Tiara Amarante, James Rogers, Melissa Nickerson, Jean Valcourt, Alvin Campbell, Ta-Tarnya Caffie, Victor Daniel, Mowafi Shora, Lisajoy Smith, Moses Reynoso, Emmah Katongole, Miguel Berrios, Lance Matthews, John Simpson, Romuald Claude, Kemar Swaby, Joel Monteiro, William Melo, Osemhengie Aiguokhian, Michael Victoriano, Joel Selmond, Mohamed Ezzeldin, Natalia Dunson, Noman Sultan, Luigi Natale, Samuel Aviles, Patrick Robillard, Dervon Benedict, Roman Lora Rodriguez, Carlos Gimenez, Marianne Keenan, Rudolph Ricci, Peter Moore, Mohd Abulzahab, Trishawna Newson, Wilking Santana, Shaun Murphy, Sheldon Mercer, Shawn Kane, Jean Pierre Noel, Jamal Soufan, Lawal Sule, Eustaquio Docarmo, Daeshawn Warren, James Curtis, Joseph Mesite, William Raye, Idania Aviles, El Mehdi Lakhnigue, Lester Scott, Ewan Ledford, Georges Achi, Antony Suero, Raoul Pierre, Heidi Wollerman, Didier Zon, Altrenzo Key, Michael Jirichian, Paul Flores, Keith Wilson, Harold Herman, Rory Collins, Sean Herman, Jerome Spiezio and Emanuel Cunningham
Defendant: Rasier, LLC, Nelson Chai, Dara Khosrowshahi, DOES 1-10, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Portier, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv12658
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Referring Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2019 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Kelley, M.)
February 16, 2019 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. The current deadlines in this matter are continued to March 28, 2019. (Kelley, M.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to no earlier than March 28, 2019 to all current case deadlines by Nelson Chai, Dara Khosrowshahi, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Bingham, Francis)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Defendants' Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file answers, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or before the close of business on February 22, 2019. (MacDougall, Patricia)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 22, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Nelson Chai, Dara Khosrowshahi, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Bingham, Francis)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to to Opposition Concerning Pro Hac Vice Motions (Dkt. 14) by Mohd Abulzahab.(Gardner, Joshua)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Warren Postman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7501113, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashley Keller Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-7501067, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tom Kayes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7501091 and Request for Hearing and Oral Argument filed by Nelson Chai, Dara Khosrowshahi, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order, #2 Affidavit of Francis J. Bingham)(Bingham, Francis)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Asha A. Santos on behalf of Nelson Chai, Dara Khosrowshahi, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Santos, Asha)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ashley Keller. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Warren Postman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7501113 by Mohd Abulzahab. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Warren Postman)(Gardner, Joshua)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tom Kayes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7501091 by Mohd Abulzahab. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tom Kayes)(Gardner, Joshua)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashley Keller Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-7501067 by Mohd Abulzahab. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ashley Keller)(Gardner, Joshua)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Bono, Christine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nelson Chai answer due 2/14/2019; Dara Khosrowshahi answer due 2/14/2019; Portier, LLC answer due 2/14/2019; Rasier, LLC answer due 2/14/2019; Uber Technologies, Inc. answer due 2/14/2019. (Bono, Christine)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 14, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Nelson Chai, Dara Khosrowshahi, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Bingham, Francis)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J. Bingham on behalf of Nelson Chai, Dara Khosrowshahi, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Bingham, Francis)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nelson Chai, DOES 1-10, Dara Khosrowshahi, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7473327 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mohd Abulzahab, Georges Achi, Osemhengie Aiguokhian, Tiara Amarante, Idania Aviles, Samuel Aviles, Chafiq Belcaid, Dervon Benedict, Miguel Berrios, Ta-Tarnya Caffie, Alvin Campbell, Yakup Cevik, Romuald Claude, Rory Collins, Emanuel Cunningham, James Curtis, Victor Daniel, Eustaquio Docarmo, Wenjun Dou, Natalia Dunson, Mohamed Ezzeldin, Paul Flores, Roy Gendron, Carlos Gimenez, Vernon Hanberry, Willie Harrison, Thomas Heelan, Harold Herman, Darcel Jackson, Michael Jirichian, Aaron Jones, Shawn Kane, Emmah Katongole, Marianne Keenan, Altrenzo Key, El Mehdi Lakhnigue, Ewan Ledford, Roman Lora Rodriguez, Darwin Mateo, Lance Matthews, William Melo, Sheldon Mercer, Joseph Mesite, Joel Monteiro, Peter Moore, Shaun Murphy, Luigi Natale, Trishawna Newson, Melissa Nickerson, Raoul Pierre, Jean Pierre Noel, William Raye, Moses Reynoso, Rudolph Ricci, Patrick Robillard, James Rogers, Rebecca Saber, Wilking Santana, Lester Scott, Joel Selmond, Mowafi Shora, John Simpson, Lisajoy Smith, Alie Soufan, Jamal Soufan, Jerome Spiezio, Antony Suero, Lawal Sule, Noman Sultan, Kemar Swaby, Derek Thomas, Jean Valcourt, Jairo Valdez, Michael Victoriano, Daeshawn Warren, Keith Wilson, Heidi Wollerman, Didier Zon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category of Action)(Gardner, Joshua) (Attachment 2, 3 replaced on 12/31/2018) to flatten file (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abulzahab et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alie Soufan
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Gendron
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Thomas
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcel Jackson
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Mateo
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jairo Valdez
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Hanberry
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenjun Dou
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chafiq Belcaid
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Harrison
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Jones
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Saber
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Heelan
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yakup Cevik
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiara Amarante
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rogers
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Nickerson
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Valcourt
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Campbell
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ta-Tarnya Caffie
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Daniel
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mowafi Shora
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisajoy Smith
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Reynoso
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmah Katongole
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Berrios
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Matthews
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Simpson
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romuald Claude
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemar Swaby
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Monteiro
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Melo
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osemhengie Aiguokhian
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Victoriano
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Selmond
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Ezzeldin
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Dunson
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noman Sultan
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Natale
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Aviles
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Robillard
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dervon Benedict
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Lora Rodriguez
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gimenez
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Keenan
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Ricci
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Moore
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohd Abulzahab
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trishawna Newson
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilking Santana
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Murphy
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon Mercer
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Kane
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Pierre Noel
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Soufan
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawal Sule
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eustaquio Docarmo
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daeshawn Warren
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Curtis
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mesite
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Raye
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idania Aviles
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Mehdi Lakhnigue
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Scott
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ewan Ledford
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georges Achi
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antony Suero
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raoul Pierre
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Wollerman
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Didier Zon
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altrenzo Key
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jirichian
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Flores
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Wilson
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Herman
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Collins
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Herman
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Spiezio
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Cunningham
Represented By: Joshua W. Gardner
Represented By: Ashley C. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Asha A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Chai
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Asha A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dara Khosrowshahi
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Asha A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Asha A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portier, LLC
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Asha A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?